Dr. Hiller, István (MSZP)
|
Parliamentary Group Function | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Term | Parliamentary Group | Function | from | to |
2010-2014 | MSZP | Deputy Parliamentary Group Leader | 07-12-2011 | 05-05-2014 |
MSZP | Deputy Parliamentary Group Leader | 12-07-2010 | 20-11-2011 | |
2002-2006 | MSZP | Deputy Parliamentary Group Leader | 14-02-2005 | 15-05-2006 |
MSZP | Deputy Parliamentary Group Leader | 06-12-2004 | 07-12-2004 |
State functions | ||
---|---|---|
Function | from | to |
Deputy Speaker of the National Assembly | 08-05-2018 | 01-05-2022 |
Deputy Speaker of the National Assembly | 06-05-2014 | 07-05-2018 |
Minister of Education and Culture | 16-04-2009 | 29-05-2010 |
Minister of Education and Culture | 09-06-2006 | 15-04-2009 |
Minister of Cultural Heritage | 04-10-2004 | 13-02-2005 |
Minister of Cultural Heritage | 19-05-2003 | 03-10-2004 |
Political Secretary of State of the Ministry of Education | 27-05-2002 | 18-05-2003 |
Elections | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Term | Constituency | from | to | |
2022- | 03-04-2022 | Budapest 16.const | 02-05-2022 | |
2018-2022 | 08-04-2018 | Budapest 16.const | 08-05-2018 | 01-05-2022 |
2014-2018 | 06-04-2014 | Budapest 16.const | 06-05-2014 | 07-05-2018 |
2010-2014 | 25-04-2010 | national (elective) list | 14-05-2010 | 05-05-2014 |
2006-2010 | 09-04-2006 | Budapest 29.const | 16-05-2006 | 13-05-2010 |
2002-2006 | Budapest 29.const | 15-05-2002 | 15-05-2006 |
Number of papers presented | ||
---|---|---|
Term | Number of individual proposals | Number of non-individual proposals |
2022- | 39 | 27 |
2018-2022 | 91 | 41 |
2014-2018 | 103 | 88 |
2010-2014 | 69 | 180 |
2002-2006 | 5 | 4 |
Contribution to debates | |||
---|---|---|---|
Term | Number of contributions to debates | Number of technical contributions | Number of temporary videos |
2022- | 41 | ||
2018-2022 | 63 | 2597 | |
2014-2018 | 75 | 4000 | |
2010-2014 | 205 | ||
2006-2010 | 161 | ||
2002-2006 | 97 | 1 |
Declaration of assets | |||
---|---|---|---|
Declaration of assets | Date of financial status | Deadline of submission | Submitted |
Declaration of assets 2022 | 02.05.2022 | 01.06.2022 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2014 | 06.05.2014 | 05.06.2014 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2018 | 08.05.2018 | 07.06.2018 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2011 | 31.12.2011 | 31.01.2012 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2012 | 31.12.2012 | 31.01.2013 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2013 | 31.12.2013 | 31.01.2014 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2014 | 31.12.2014 | 31.01.2015 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2015 | 31.12.2015 | 31.01.2016 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2016 | 31.12.2016 | 31.01.2017 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2017 | 31.12.2017 | 31.01.2018 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2018 | 31.12.2018 | 31.01.2019 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2019 | 31.12.2019 | 31.01.2020 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2020 | 31.12.2020 | 31.01.2021 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2021 | 31.12.2021 | 31.01.2022 | Yes |
Declaration of assets (from 1 August 2022) |
---|
2022-2026 |
Original declaration of assets - 05 Augusztus 2022. |
Declaration of assets after 01.01.2023 | |||
---|---|---|---|
Declaration of assets | Date of financial status | Deadline of submission | Submitted |
Declaration of assets 2022 | 01.11.2022 | 31.01.2023 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2023 | 31.12.2023 | 31.01.2024 | Yes |
Academic degree | Year of issue |
---|---|
Egyetemi doktor | 1990 |
PhD | 1995 |
Language skills | ||
---|---|---|
Language | Degree | Type |
Latin | advanced | C |
Italian | medium | C |
Language skills | |
---|---|
Language | Degree |
English | conversational |
German | negotiational |