Novák, Előd (Mi Hazánk)
|
Parliamentary Group Function | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Term | Parliamentary Group | Function | from | to |
2022- | Mi Hazánk | Deputy Parliamentary Group Leader | 02-05-2022 |
Elections | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Term | Constituency | from | to | |
2022- | 03-04-2022 | national (elective) list | 02-05-2022 | |
2014-2018 | 06-04-2014 | national (elective) list | 06-05-2014 | 31-08-2016 |
2010-2014 | 25-04-2010 | national (elective) list | 14-05-2010 | 05-05-2014 |
Number of papers presented | ||
---|---|---|
Term | Number of individual proposals | Number of non-individual proposals |
2022- | 227 | 86 |
2014-2018 | 124 | 142 |
2010-2014 | 66 | 309 |
Contribution to debates | |||
---|---|---|---|
Term | Number of contributions to debates | Number of technical contributions | Number of temporary videos |
2022- | 162 | 1 | |
2014-2018 | 232 | 4 | 2 |
2010-2014 | 547 | 10 |
Declaration of assets | |||
---|---|---|---|
Declaration of assets | Date of financial status | Deadline of submission | Submitted |
Declaration of assets 2022 | 02.05.2022 | 01.06.2022 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2016 | 31.08.2016 | 03.10.2016 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2014 | 06.05.2014 | 05.06.2014 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2011 | 31.12.2011 | 31.01.2012 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2012 | 31.12.2012 | 31.01.2013 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2013 | 31.12.2013 | 31.01.2014 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2014 | 31.12.2014 | 31.01.2015 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2015 | 31.12.2015 | 31.01.2016 | Yes |
Declaration of assets (from 1 August 2022) |
---|
2022-2026 |
Original declaration of assets - 05 Augusztus 2022. |
Declaration of assets after 01.01.2023 | |||
---|---|---|---|
Declaration of assets | Date of financial status | Deadline of submission | Submitted |
Declaration of assets 2022 | 01.11.2022 | 31.01.2023 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2023 | 31.12.2023 | 31.01.2024 | Yes |