Dr. Fónagy, János (Fidesz)
|
Parliamentary Group Function | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Term | Parliamentary Group | Function | from | to |
2006-2010 | Fidesz | Deputy Parliamentary Group Leader | 05-10-2009 | 05-10-2009 |
2002-2006 | Fidesz | Deputy Parliamentary Group Leader | 14-06-2005 | 14-06-2005 |
Fidesz | Deputy Parliamentary Group Leader | 07-06-2005 | 07-06-2005 | |
Fidesz | Deputy Parliamentary Group Leader | 26-04-2004 | 26-04-2004 | |
Fidesz | Deputy Parliamentary Group Leader | 17-02-2004 | 17-02-2004 | |
Fidesz | Deputy Parliamentary Group Leader | 27-10-2003 | 27-10-2003 | |
Fidesz | Deputy Parliamentary Group Leader | 13-10-2003 | 13-10-2003 |
State functions | ||
---|---|---|
Function | from | to |
Nemzetgazdasági Minisztérium államtitkára | 01-01-2024 | |
Gazdaságfejlesztési Minisztérium államtitkára | 01-01-2023 | 31-12-2023 |
State Secretary of the Cabinet Office of the Prime Minister | 25-05-2022 | 31-12-2022 |
Miniszterelnöki Kormányiroda államtitkára | 22-05-2018 | 24-05-2022 |
Nemzeti Fejlesztési Minisztérium államtitkára | 15-06-2014 | 17-05-2018 |
Nemzeti Fejlesztési Minisztérium államtitkára | 02-06-2010 | 05-06-2014 |
Minister of Transport and Water Management | 01-12-2000 | 26-05-2002 |
Parliamentary Secretary for Economy | 14-07-1998 | 31-01-2000 |
Elections | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Term | Constituency | from | to | |
2022- | 03-04-2022 | national (elective) list | 02-05-2022 | |
2018-2022 | 08-04-2018 | national (elective) list | 08-05-2018 | 01-05-2022 |
2014-2018 | 06-04-2014 | Budapest 3.const | 06-05-2014 | 07-05-2018 |
2010-2014 | 25-04-2010 | Budapest 10.const | 14-05-2010 | 05-05-2014 |
2006-2010 | 23-04-2006 | Budapest county regional list | 16-05-2006 | 13-05-2010 |
2002-2006 | Borsod-Abaúj-Zemplén county regional list | 15-05-2002 | 15-05-2006 | |
1998-2002 | Borsod-Abaúj-Zemplén county regional list | 18-06-1998 | 14-05-2002 |
Number of papers presented | ||
---|---|---|
Term | Number of individual proposals | Number of non-individual proposals |
2022- | 5 | 1 |
2018-2022 | 1 | 1 |
2014-2018 | 5 | 2 |
2010-2014 | 5 | 10 |
2006-2010 | 69 | 275 |
2002-2006 | 91 | 257 |
Contribution to debates | |||
---|---|---|---|
Term | Number of contributions to debates | Number of technical contributions | Number of temporary videos |
2022- | 222 | ||
2018-2022 | 107 | 1 | |
2014-2018 | 361 | 3 | |
2010-2014 | 753 | 11 | |
2006-2010 | 110 | 1 | |
2002-2006 | 174 | 1 | |
1998-2002 | 222 | 10 |
Declaration of assets | |||
---|---|---|---|
Declaration of assets | Date of financial status | Deadline of submission | Submitted |
Declaration of assets 2022 | 02.05.2022 | 01.06.2022 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2014 | 06.05.2014 | 05.06.2014 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2018 | 08.05.2018 | 07.06.2018 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2011 | 31.12.2011 | 31.01.2012 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2012 | 31.12.2012 | 31.01.2013 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2013 | 31.12.2013 | 31.01.2014 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2014 | 31.12.2014 | 31.01.2015 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2015 | 31.12.2015 | 31.01.2016 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2016 | 31.12.2016 | 31.01.2017 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2017 | 31.12.2017 | 31.01.2018 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2018 | 31.12.2018 | 31.01.2019 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2019 | 31.12.2019 | 31.01.2020 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2020 | 31.12.2020 | 31.01.2021 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2021 | 31.12.2021 | 31.01.2022 | Yes |
Declaration of assets (from 1 August 2022) |
---|
2022-2026 |
Original declaration of assets - 05 Augusztus 2022. |
Declaration of assets after 01.01.2023 | |||
---|---|---|---|
Declaration of assets | Date of financial status | Deadline of submission | Submitted |
Declaration of assets 2022 | 01.11.2022 | 31.01.2023 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2023 | 31.12.2023 | 31.01.2024 | Yes |