Dr. Schaller-Baross, Ernő
Membership of European Parliament | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
EP Group | from | to | Delegated by | In place of |
Patriots for Europe Group | 16-07-2024 | Hungarian Civic Union-Christian-Democratic People's Party | ||
Non-attached | 05-03-2021 | 15-07-2024 | Hungarian Civic Union-Christian-Democratic People's Party | |
Group of the European People's Party (Christian Democrats) | 10-01-2021 | 04-03-2021 | Hungarian Civic Union-Christian-Democratic People's Party | Dr. Szájer, József |