Kósa, Lajos (Fidesz)
|
Parliamentary Group Function | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Term | Parliamentary Group | Function | from | to |
2022- | Fidesz | Deputy Parliamentary Group Leader | 02-05-2022 | |
2014-2018 | Fidesz | Parliamentary Group Leader | 01-10-2015 | 01-10-2017 |
Fidesz | Deputy Parliamentary Group Leader | 04-07-2014 | 30-09-2015 | |
Fidesz | Deputy Parliamentary Group Leader | 06-05-2014 | 03-07-2014 | |
2010-2014 | Fidesz | Deputy Parliamentary Group Leader | 14-05-2010 | 05-05-2014 |
2006-2010 | Fidesz | Deputy Parliamentary Group Leader | 16-05-2006 | 13-05-2010 |
2002-2006 | Fidesz | Deputy Parliamentary Group Leader | 15-05-2002 | 15-05-2006 |
1998-2002 | Fidesz | Deputy Parliamentary Group Leader | 08-09-1998 | 14-05-2002 |
State functions | ||
---|---|---|
Function | from | to |
Minister without Portfolio responsible for the development of county-ranked cities | 02-10-2017 | 17-05-2018 |
Elections | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Term | Constituency | from | to | |
2022- | 03-04-2022 | Hajdú-Bihar county 1.const | 02-05-2022 | |
2018-2022 | 08-04-2018 | Hajdú-Bihar county 1.const | 08-05-2018 | 01-05-2022 |
2014-2018 | 06-04-2014 | Hajdú-Bihar county 1.const | 06-05-2014 | 07-05-2018 |
2010-2014 | 11-04-2010 | Hajdú-Bihar county 3.const | 14-05-2010 | 05-05-2014 |
2006-2010 | 09-04-2006 | Hajdú-Bihar county 3.const | 16-05-2006 | 13-05-2010 |
2002-2006 | Hajdú-Bihar county 3.const | 15-05-2002 | 15-05-2006 | |
1998-2002 | Hajdú-Bihar county 3.const | 18-06-1998 | 14-05-2002 | |
1994-98 | Hajdú-Bihar county regional list | 28-06-1994 | 17-06-1998 | |
1990-94 | national (elective) list | 02-05-1990 | 27-06-1994 |
Number of papers presented | ||
---|---|---|
Term | Number of individual proposals | Number of non-individual proposals |
2022- | 13 | 3 |
2018-2022 | 12 | 8 |
2014-2018 | 34 | 22 |
2010-2014 | 54 | 206 |
2006-2010 | 20 | 119 |
2002-2006 | 18 | 131 |
1998-2002 | 6 | 17 |
Contribution to debates | |||
---|---|---|---|
Term | Number of contributions to debates | Number of technical contributions | Number of temporary videos |
2022- | 34 | ||
2018-2022 | 56 | 1 | |
2014-2018 | 103 | 3 | 1 |
2010-2014 | 110 | 1 | |
2006-2010 | 24 | ||
2002-2006 | 79 | 2 | |
1998-2002 | 70 | 1 |
Declaration of assets | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Declaration of assets | Date of financial status | Deadline of submission | Submitted | Comment |
Declaration of assets 2022 | 02.05.2022 | 01.06.2022 | Yes | |
Declaration of assets 2014 | 06.05.2014 | 05.06.2014 | Yes | |
Declaration of assets 2018 | 08.05.2018 | 07.06.2018 | Yes | |
Declaration of assets 2011 | 31.12.2011 | 31.01.2012 | Yes | |
Declaration of assets 2012 | 31.12.2012 | 31.01.2013 | Yes | |
Declaration of assets 2013 | 31.12.2013 | 31.01.2014 | Yes | |
Declaration of assets 2014 | 31.12.2014 | 31.01.2015 | Yes | |
Declaration of assets 2015 | 31.12.2015 | 31.01.2016 | Yes | Technikai hiba miatt újraszkennelve. |
Declaration of assets 2016 | 31.12.2016 | 31.01.2017 | Yes | |
Declaration of assets 2017 | 31.12.2017 | 31.01.2018 | Yes | |
Declaration of assets 2018 | 31.12.2018 | 31.01.2019 | Yes | |
Declaration of assets 2019 | 31.12.2019 | 31.01.2020 | Yes | |
Declaration of assets 2020 | 31.12.2020 | 31.01.2021 | Yes | |
Declaration of assets 2021 | 31.12.2021 | 31.01.2022 | Yes |
Declaration of assets (from 1 August 2022) |
---|
2022-2026 |
Original declaration of assets - 05 Augusztus 2022. |
1. modification - 09 augusztus 2022. |
Declaration of assets after 01.01.2023 | |||
---|---|---|---|
Declaration of assets | Date of financial status | Deadline of submission | Submitted |
Declaration of assets 2022 | 01.11.2022 | 31.01.2023 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2023 | 31.12.2023 | 31.01.2024 | Yes |
Language skills | |
---|---|
Language | Degree |
English | conversational |
Russian | conversational |
MP's homepage: www.facebook.com/kosalajos