Gyárfás, Ildikó
Parliamentary Group Function | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Term | Parliamentary Group | Function | from | to |
1998-2002 | MSZP | Deputy Parliamentary Group Leader | 27-11-2001 | 27-11-2001 |
Elections | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Term | Constituency | from | to | |
2006-2010 | 09-04-2006 | Borsod-Abaúj-Zemplén county 7.const | 16-05-2006 | 13-05-2010 |
2002-2006 | Borsod-Abaúj-Zemplén county 7.const | 15-05-2002 | 15-05-2006 | |
1998-2002 | Borsod-Abaúj-Zemplén county 7.const | 18-06-1998 | 14-05-2002 | |
1994-98 | Borsod-Abaúj-Zemplén county 7.const | 28-06-1994 | 17-06-1998 |
Number of papers presented | ||
---|---|---|
Term | Number of individual proposals | Number of non-individual proposals |
2006-2010 | 1 | 28 |
2002-2006 | 3 | 14 |
1998-2002 | 18 | 90 |
Contribution to debates | |||
---|---|---|---|
Term | Number of contributions to debates | Number of technical contributions | Number of temporary videos |
2006-2010 | 2 | ||
2002-2006 | 4 | ||
1998-2002 | 15 |