Hirt, Ferenc
Parliamentary Group Function | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Term | Parliamentary Group | Function | from | to |
2006-2010 | Fidesz | Deputy Parliamentary Group Leader | 11-11-2008 | 11-11-2008 |
Elections | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Term | Constituency | from | to | |
2018-2022 | 08-04-2018 | national (elective) list | 08-05-2018 | 07-12-2018 |
2014-2018 | 06-04-2014 | Tolna county 3.const | 06-05-2014 | 07-05-2018 |
2010-2014 | 11-04-2010 | Tolna county 5.const | 14-05-2010 | 05-05-2014 |
2006-2010 | 23-04-2006 | Tolna county 5.const | 16-05-2006 | 13-05-2010 |
Number of papers presented | ||
---|---|---|
Term | Number of individual proposals | Number of non-individual proposals |
2014-2018 | 4 | 4 |
2010-2014 | 7 | 32 |
2006-2010 | 52 | 217 |
Contribution to debates | |||
---|---|---|---|
Term | Number of contributions to debates | Number of technical contributions | Number of temporary videos |
2014-2018 | 7 | ||
2010-2014 | 20 | ||
2006-2010 | 43 |
Declaration of assets | |||
---|---|---|---|
Declaration of assets | Date of financial status | Deadline of submission | Submitted |
Declaration of assets 2014 | 06.05.2014 | 05.06.2014 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2018 | 08.05.2018 | 07.06.2018 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2011 | 31.12.2011 | 31.01.2012 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2012 | 31.12.2012 | 31.01.2013 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2013 | 31.12.2013 | 31.01.2014 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2014 | 31.12.2014 | 31.01.2015 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2015 | 31.12.2015 | 31.01.2016 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2016 | 31.12.2016 | 31.01.2017 | Yes |
Declaration of assets 2017 | 31.12.2017 | 31.01.2018 | Yes |