Soós, Károly Attila
State functions | ||
---|---|---|
Function | from | to |
Parliamentary Secretary for Industry, Trade and Tourism | 15-07-1994 | 30-09-1996 |
Elections | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|
Term | Constituency | from | to | |
1994-98 | national (elective) list | 28-06-1994 | 01-01-1998 | |
1990-94 | national (elective) list | 02-05-1990 | 27-06-1994 |
Academic degree | Year of issue |
---|---|
A Magyar Tudományos Akadémia doktora | 1967 |
Language skills | |
---|---|
Language | Degree |
English | advanced |
French | advanced |
Russian | advanced |
Serbo-croatien | medium |